THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 10:17:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Unit G1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120 x 50916
Fax: 905-494-6758
Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
GPS Health Navigators
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 416-477-9936
Fax: 1-855-461-3429
Address: G2-145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Major St
Toronto ON M5S 2L1
Phone: (416) 963-9640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humaira Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 109153 ) Dr. H. Vaid (CPSO#: 118222 )
Business Address: N.1.015-2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Business Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 145 Front Street East
Unit G1
Toronto Ontario M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: 905 494 2120 x 50916
Fax: 905-494-6758
Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
GPS Health Navigators
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: 416-477-9936
Fax: 1-855-461-3429
Address: G2-145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 38 Major St
Toronto ON M5S 2L1
Phone: (416) 963-9640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humaira Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 109153 ) Dr. H. Vaid (CPSO#: 118222 )
Business Address: N.1.015-2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Business Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAIRA FATIMA SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUMAIRA FATIMA SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016