THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:55:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
William Osler Health System Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
William Osler Health System - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humaira Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 109153 ) Dr. H. Vaid (CPSO#: 118222 )
Business Address: N.1.015-2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Business Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
William Osler Health System Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Lynch Street
William Osler Health System - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Humaira Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 109153 ) Dr. H. Vaid (CPSO#: 118222 )
Business Address: N.1.015-2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Business Address: suite 310-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARIS MUNIR VAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARIS MUNIR VAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019