THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:47:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Department of Medicine
B9-107
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3219
Fax: 519-663-3014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sattin Kane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kane (CPSO#: 109701 ) Dr. M. Sattin (CPSO#: 109698 )
Business Address: 312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 4N7
(519) 432-6786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339-291 Windermere Rd
University Hospital
Department of Medicine
B9-107
London ON N6G 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-663-3219
Fax: 519-663-3014

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sattin Kane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kane (CPSO#: 109701 ) Dr. M. Sattin (CPSO#: 109698 )
Business Address: 312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 4N7
(519) 432-6786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NICHOLAS SATTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL NICHOLAS SATTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016