THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:32:23 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-6786
Fax: (519) 432-3292
Address: South Huron Hospital Association
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Phone: 5196729660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sattin Kane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kane (CPSO#: 109701 ) Dr. M. Sattin (CPSO#: 109698 )
Business Address: 312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 4N7
(519) 432-6786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 432-6786
Fax: (519) 432-3292
Address: South Huron Hospital Association
24 Huron Street West
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 346 Platt's Lane
London Ontario N6G 1J1
Phone: 5196729660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sattin Kane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kane (CPSO#: 109701 ) Dr. M. Sattin (CPSO#: 109698 )
Business Address: 312 Oxford Street West
London Ontario N6H 4N7
(519) 432-6786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADITI PRASHANT KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADITI PRASHANT KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016