THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 308 Palladium Drive
Palladium Medical Clinic
Suite 210
Ottawa Ontario K2V 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3422
Fax: 613-599-6922

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basi Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 112614 ) Dr. A. Basi (CPSO#: 110126 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 17 Aberdeen Street
Apartment 522
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3J3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 308 Palladium Drive
Palladium Medical Clinic
Suite 210
Ottawa Ontario K2V 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-599-3422
Fax: 613-599-6922

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basi Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 112614 ) Dr. A. Basi (CPSO#: 110126 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 17 Aberdeen Street
Apartment 522
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3J3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR BASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMRIT KAUR BASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016