THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Civic Hospital
Anesthesia
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basi Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 112614 ) Dr. A. Basi (CPSO#: 110126 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 17 Aberdeen Street
Apartment 522
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3J3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Civic Hospital
Anesthesia
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137227000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 21 Oct 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Basi Rai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rai (CPSO#: 112614 ) Dr. A. Basi (CPSO#: 110126 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Anesthesia Department
Suite 314
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: 17 Aberdeen Street
Apartment 522
Ottawa Ontario K1S 3J3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJIT SINGH RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AJIT SINGH RAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017