THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church St.
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-463-1500
Fax: 416-463-6577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eryuzlu and Herriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eryuzlu (CPSO#: 118996 ) Dr. J. Herriot (CPSO#: 110192 )
Business Address: 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Church Wellesley Health Centre
491 Church St.
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-463-1500
Fax: 416-463-6577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eryuzlu and Herriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eryuzlu (CPSO#: 118996 ) Dr. J. Herriot (CPSO#: 110192 )
Business Address: 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON FORREST HERRIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRIOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHON FORREST HERRIOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRIOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016