THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 19:32:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-2175 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164927700
Fax: 4164925776
Address: 481 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4K 1P5
Phone: 4168881008
Fax: 4165728717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eryuzlu and Herriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eryuzlu (CPSO#: 118996 ) Dr. J. Herriot (CPSO#: 110192 )
Business Address: 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-2175 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164927700
Fax: 4164925776
Address: 481 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4K 1P5
Phone: 4168881008
Fax: 4165728717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eryuzlu and Herriot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eryuzlu (CPSO#: 118996 ) Dr. J. Herriot (CPSO#: 110192 )
Business Address: 491 Church Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHENIZ JOZEFIN ERYUZLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERYUZLU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHENIZ JOZEFIN ERYUZLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERYUZLU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019