THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:45:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Office 4-230.09
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 1144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CALO AND FERREYRO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferreyro (CPSO#: 110230 ) Dr. N. Causada Calo (CPSO#: 114148 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
ROOM 16-034
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Avenue
Office 4-230.09
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165864800
Extension: 1144
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CALO AND FERREYRO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferreyro (CPSO#: 110230 ) Dr. N. Causada Calo (CPSO#: 114148 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
ROOM 16-034
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2023
30 Apr 2030
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 30 2030
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BRUNO LEONEL FERREYRO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. FERREYRO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FERREYRO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FERREYRO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FERREYRO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2030.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. BRUNO LEONEL FERREYRO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. FERREYRO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FERREYRO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FERREYRO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FERREYRO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2030.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2030

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016