THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:31:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Unity Health Toronto - St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-864-5882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CALO AND FERREYRO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferreyro (CPSO#: 110230 ) Dr. N. Causada Calo (CPSO#: 114148 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
ROOM 16-034
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Unity Health Toronto - St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 416-864-5882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CALO AND FERREYRO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferreyro (CPSO#: 110230 ) Dr. N. Causada Calo (CPSO#: 114148 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
ROOM 16-034
Toronto ON M5B 1W8

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2023
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NATALIA SOLEDAD CAUSADA CALO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CAUSADA CALO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on June 30, 2027 or when Dr. CAUSADA CALO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CAUSADA CALO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CAUSADA CALO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. NATALIA SOLEDAD CAUSADA CALO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CAUSADA CALO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on June 30, 2027 or when Dr. CAUSADA CALO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CAUSADA CALO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CAUSADA CALO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2023. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 June, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017