THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:59:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Hospital
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heena Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Munir (CPSO#: 110436 ) Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 110257 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Hospital
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heena Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Munir (CPSO#: 110436 ) Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 110257 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEENA HARLEEN KAUR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEENA HARLEEN KAUR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016