THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 13:27:22 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 301-1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 833-904-4583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heena Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Munir (CPSO#: 110436 ) Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 110257 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 301-1055 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1 833-904-4583
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heena Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Munir (CPSO#: 110436 ) Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 110257 )
Business Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILAL MUNIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BILAL MUNIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016