THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 13:25:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Southcott (CPSO#: 31853 ) Dr. D. Southcott (CPSO#: 110997 ) Dr. E. Hooper (CPSO#: 50793 )
Business Address: Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Southcott (CPSO#: 31853 ) Dr. D. Southcott (CPSO#: 110997 ) Dr. E. Hooper (CPSO#: 50793 )
Business Address: Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAPHNE NINA SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAPHNE NINA SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016