THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:08:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Extension: 4417
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Southcott (CPSO#: 31853 ) Dr. D. Southcott (CPSO#: 110997 ) Dr. E. Hooper (CPSO#: 50793 )
Business Address: Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Healthcare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 322-2501
Extension: 4417
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 11 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Southcott (CPSO#: 31853 ) Dr. D. Southcott (CPSO#: 110997 ) Dr. E. Hooper (CPSO#: 50793 )
Business Address: Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 322-2501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DIANA HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DIANA HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982