THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:19:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Ave
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LAUREN BOUILLON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bouillon (CPSO#: 112092 )
Business Address: 118 7th Ave
Hanover Medical Clinic
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover Medical Clinic
118 7th Ave
Hanover Ontario N4N 2G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site Chesley
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Chesley Site
LOCATION: Chesley

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LAUREN BOUILLON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bouillon (CPSO#: 112092 )
Business Address: 118 7th Ave
Hanover Medical Clinic
Hanover ON N4N 2G9
(519) 364-2820

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN MICHELLE BOUILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUILLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN MICHELLE BOUILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUILLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017