THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of San Carlos, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover and District Hospital
90 7th Ave
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of San Carlos, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hanover and District Hospital
90 7th Ave
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PABLO DAVID GARCIA RAMIREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA RAMIREZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PABLO DAVID GARCIA RAMIREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA RAMIREZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of San Carlos, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020