THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd
Vibrant Medical Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2B-9200 Dufferin St
Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0C6
Phone: 905-417-3125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-249 Marlee Ave
Marlee Medical Centre
North York ON M6B 4B8
Phone: 416- 780-9986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508
Address: 3900 Rutherford Rd
West Vaughan Medical Centre
Woodbridge ON L4H 3G8
Phone: 905-417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakanksha Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K0H3
905-553-3730

Corporation Name: Nirosion Manokharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 100
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
9055533730
Business Address: Vibrant Medical Clinic
Building E Unit 100
2640 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON L4K 0H3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd
Vibrant Medical Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2B-9200 Dufferin St
Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
Concord ON L4K 0C6
Phone: 905-417-3125
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-249 Marlee Ave
Marlee Medical Centre
North York ON M6B 4B8
Phone: 416- 780-9986
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B1
Phone: 416-314-4100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Teston Medical Center
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508
Address: 3900 Rutherford Rd
West Vaughan Medical Centre
Woodbridge ON L4H 3G8
Phone: 905-417-5461
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakanksha Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K0H3
905-553-3730

Corporation Name: Nirosion Manokharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 100
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
9055533730
Business Address: Vibrant Medical Clinic
Building E Unit 100
2640 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON L4K 0H3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROSION MANOKHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOKHARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIROSION MANOKHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOKHARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017