THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 19:25:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vibrant Medical Clinic
2640 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11290 Pine Valley Drive
Vaughan Ontario L3L 0B1
Phone: 9058323000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakanksha Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K0H3
905-553-3730

Corporation Name: Nirosion Manokharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 100
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
9055533730
Business Address: Vibrant Medical Clinic
Building E Unit 100
2640 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON L4K 0H3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vibrant Medical Clinic
2640 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-553-3730
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 11290 Pine Valley Drive
Vaughan Ontario L3L 0B1
Phone: 9058323000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3-270 Purple Creek Rd
Woodbridge ON L4H 5E5
Phone: 905-417-2058
Fax: 905-417-1508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakanksha Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Concord Ontario L4K0H3
905-553-3730

Corporation Name: Nirosion Manokharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Manokharan (CPSO#: 112184 ) Dr. A. Sharma (CPSO#: 120949 )
Business Address: 2640 Rutherford Road
Suite 100
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
9055533730
Business Address: Vibrant Medical Clinic
Building E Unit 100
2640 Rutherford Rd
Concord ON L4K 0H3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAKANKSHA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAKANKSHA SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020