THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
RM 2W106
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: 877-927-8451
Address: 430 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Ian Anderson House
Oakville Ontario L6J 7X2
Phone: 905-337-8004
Fax: 1-905-337-8006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIRRELLO AND BARONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barone (CPSO#: 112308 ) Dr. D. Pirrello (CPSO#: 112416 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
RM 2W106
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: 877-927-8451
Address: 430 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Ian Anderson House
Oakville Ontario L6J 7X2
Phone: 905-337-8004
Fax: 1-905-337-8006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIRRELLO AND BARONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barone (CPSO#: 112308 ) Dr. D. Pirrello (CPSO#: 112416 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINNAMON ROSE BARONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINNAMON ROSE BARONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017