THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:52:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-635-7313
Fax: 905-635-2464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIRRELLO AND BARONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barone (CPSO#: 112308 ) Dr. D. Pirrello (CPSO#: 112416 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Rd E
Burlington ON L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-635-7313
Fax: 905-635-2464

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PIRRELLO AND BARONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barone (CPSO#: 112308 ) Dr. D. Pirrello (CPSO#: 112416 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Address: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ADAM PIRRELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRRELLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ADAM PIRRELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRRELLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017