THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142 C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6046
Fax: 855-956-3935
Address: Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Phone: (705) 337-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boulianne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Plamondon (CPSO#: 121171 ) Dr. C. Boulianne (CPSO#: 112492 )
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 142 C Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 371-2220
Extension: 6046
Fax: 855-956-3935
Address: Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 3H6
Phone: (705) 337-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boulianne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Plamondon (CPSO#: 121171 ) Dr. C. Boulianne (CPSO#: 112492 )
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL LESLIE BOULIANNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULIANNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL LESLIE BOULIANNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULIANNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017