THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-337-4082
Fax: 8559563935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boulianne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Plamondon (CPSO#: 121171 ) Dr. C. Boulianne (CPSO#: 112492 )
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-337-4082
Fax: 8559563935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boulianne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Plamondon (CPSO#: 121171 ) Dr. C. Boulianne (CPSO#: 112492 )
Business Address: C-142 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H7
Business Address: 101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON P5N 3H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE PLAMONDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLAMONDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE PLAMONDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLAMONDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020