THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:39:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 314
460 SPRINGBANK DRIVE
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196728364
Fax: 5196720607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisha Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rashid (CPSO#: 112513 ) Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 117435 )
Business Address: Suite 314
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 314
460 SPRINGBANK DRIVE
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196728364
Fax: 5196720607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisha Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rashid (CPSO#: 112513 ) Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 117435 )
Business Address: Suite 314
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2017