THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Cardiac Institute
201302 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisha Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rashid (CPSO#: 112513 ) Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 117435 )
Business Address: Suite 314
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: London Cardiac Institute
201302 - 1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Ontario N6G 0W7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aisha Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rashid (CPSO#: 112513 ) Dr. H. Khan (CPSO#: 117435 )
Business Address: Suite 314
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Apr 2023
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 18 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Habib Rehman Khan may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
Khan holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Khan no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Khan's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Khan's certificate of
registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2020, and expires June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Khan's academic appointment at the University
of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Habib Rehman Khan may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Cardiology, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr.
Khan holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Khan no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Khan's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Khan's certificate of
registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2020, and expires June 30,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Khan's academic appointment at the University
of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2019