THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:17:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-672 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-0607
Fax: (905) 632-8810

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELAHN POGUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Doubelt (CPSO#: 112617 ) Dr. E. Pogue (CPSO#: 119106 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-672 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-0607
Fax: (905) 632-8810

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELAHN POGUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Doubelt (CPSO#: 112617 ) Dr. E. Pogue (CPSO#: 119106 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENA DOUBELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUBELT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENA DOUBELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUBELT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017