THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Internal Medicine
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELAHN POGUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Doubelt (CPSO#: 112617 ) Dr. E. Pogue (CPSO#: 119106 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Internal Medicine
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ELAHN POGUE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Doubelt (CPSO#: 112617 ) Dr. E. Pogue (CPSO#: 119106 )
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAHN PETER LLOYD POGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POGUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAHN PETER LLOYD POGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POGUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019