THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:08:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Address: 390 Steeles Avenue West
Unit one
Vaughan Ontario L4J 6X2
Phone: 905-881-3984
Fax: 9058813198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HABER GASNER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haber (CPSO#: 115191 ) Dr. M. Gasner (CPSO#: 112661 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
201-581 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: (613) 687-6808
Address: 390 Steeles Avenue West
Unit one
Vaughan Ontario L4J 6X2
Phone: 905-881-3984
Fax: 9058813198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Apr 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 27 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HABER GASNER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haber (CPSO#: 115191 ) Dr. M. Gasner (CPSO#: 112661 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
201-581 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAELA DANIELLE GASNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAELA DANIELLE GASNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017