THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HABER GASNER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haber (CPSO#: 115191 ) Dr. M. Gasner (CPSO#: 112661 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
201-581 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HABER GASNER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Haber (CPSO#: 115191 ) Dr. M. Gasner (CPSO#: 112661 )
Business Address: 581 Davis Drive
201-581 Davis Dr.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
905-853-3103

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN EDWARD HABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN EDWARD HABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Aug 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018