THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wan Sai Cheong and Tjong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wan Sai Cheong (CPSO#: 118710 ) Dr. M. Tjong (CPSO#: 112732 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
Adelaide Health Clinic
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wan Sai Cheong and Tjong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wan Sai Cheong (CPSO#: 118710 ) Dr. M. Tjong (CPSO#: 112732 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
Adelaide Health Clinic
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHANDRA TJONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHANDRA TJONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TJONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017