THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:57:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 324-4180
Fax: 416-324-4181
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 259-6671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-100 King St W
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1C0
Phone: (416) 367-5200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wan Sai Cheong and Tjong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wan Sai Cheong (CPSO#: 118710 ) Dr. M. Tjong (CPSO#: 112732 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
Adelaide Health Clinic
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 324-4180
Fax: 416-324-4181
Address: 3276 St Clair Ave E
Scarborough ON M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Toronto Ontario M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 259-6671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-100 King St W
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1C0
Phone: (416) 367-5200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wan Sai Cheong and Tjong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wan Sai Cheong (CPSO#: 118710 ) Dr. M. Tjong (CPSO#: 112732 )
Business Address: 333 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON M5A 2S5
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 1-100 King St W
Adelaide Health Clinic
First Canadian Place
Concourse Level C84
Toronto ON M5X 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JESSICA WAN SAI CHEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN SAI CHEONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JESSICA WAN SAI CHEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN SAI CHEONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019