THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 11:01:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058460222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Phone: 9058460222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasheed & Dr. Chehade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rasheed (CPSO#: 116637 ) Dr. H. Chehade (CPSO#: 114536 )
Business Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058460222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Phone: 9058460222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasheed & Dr. Chehade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rasheed (CPSO#: 116637 ) Dr. H. Chehade (CPSO#: 114536 )
Business Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIBA CHEHADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEHADE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIBA CHEHADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEHADE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College For Girls, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2018