THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:26:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-0222
Fax: (905) 846-8880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasheed & Dr. Chehade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rasheed (CPSO#: 116637 ) Dr. H. Chehade (CPSO#: 114536 )
Business Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-0222
Fax: (905) 846-8880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rasheed & Dr. Chehade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rasheed (CPSO#: 116637 ) Dr. H. Chehade (CPSO#: 114536 )
Business Address: 1-230 Wanless Dr
Brampton ON L7A 0X1
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI AHMED RASHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI AHMED RASHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2018