THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:31:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Birchmount Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rao and Rajasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajasingham (CPSO#: 114921 ) Dr. S. Rao (CPSO#: 114886 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Birchmount Hospital
Emergency Department
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-438-2911
Extension: 2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rao and Rajasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajasingham (CPSO#: 114921 ) Dr. S. Rao (CPSO#: 114886 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA YICHEN RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA YICHEN RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018