THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 09:15:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary ER - Scarborough health network
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount ER- Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rao and Rajasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajasingham (CPSO#: 114921 ) Dr. S. Rao (CPSO#: 114886 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164382911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Centenary ER - Scarborough health network
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Birchmount ER- Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rao and Rajasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rajasingham (CPSO#: 114921 ) Dr. S. Rao (CPSO#: 114886 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIHAN JUDE RAJASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJASINGHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIHAN JUDE RAJASINGHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJASINGHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018