THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:05:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Internal medicine
main floor
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER MANSOUR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mansour (CPSO#: 115014 )
Business Address: 6132 Creek Crossing Street
Ottawa Ontario K1W 1E2
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137464621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Internal medicine
main floor
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER MANSOUR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mansour (CPSO#: 115014 )
Business Address: 6132 Creek Crossing Street
Ottawa Ontario K1W 1E2
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MANSOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018