THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:41:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 Oak Park Blvd
Sheddon Medical
Oakville ON L6H 0M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-8771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-575 River Glen Blvd
St. Michaels medical centre
Oakville ON L6H 6X6
Phone: (289) 837-4432
Fax: 2898370220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209 Oak Park Blvd
Sheddon Medical
Oakville ON L6H 0M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-8771
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-575 River Glen Blvd
St. Michaels medical centre
Oakville ON L6H 6X6
Phone: (289) 837-4432
Fax: 2898370220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019