THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:36:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. SWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swan (CPSO#: 116638 ) Dr. T. Swan (CPSO#: 115269 )
Business Address: 30001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Ave E
St Joseph's Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. SWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swan (CPSO#: 116638 ) Dr. T. Swan (CPSO#: 115269 )
Business Address: 30001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS DANIEL SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS DANIEL SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018