THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:06:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-844-3281
Fax: 905-849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. SWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swan (CPSO#: 116638 ) Dr. T. Swan (CPSO#: 115269 )
Business Address: 30001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-844-3281
Fax: 905-849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. T. SWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Swan (CPSO#: 116638 ) Dr. T. Swan (CPSO#: 115269 )
Business Address: 30001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Swan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 17 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018