THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:29:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1051 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2Y5
Phone: 6476971000
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 2934 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Phone: (416) 667-9294
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 5928 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: (416) 678-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rashmy Amuthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeyaratnam (CPSO#: 117250 ) Dr. R. Amuthan (CPSO#: 115278 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-579-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1051 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2Y5
Phone: 6476971000
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 2934 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Phone: (416) 667-9294
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 5928 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: (416) 678-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rashmy Amuthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeyaratnam (CPSO#: 117250 ) Dr. R. Amuthan (CPSO#: 115278 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHMY AMUTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMUTHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHMY AMUTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMUTHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018