THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Noble Clinic
2934 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166678488
Fax: 4164610445
Address: Maple Clinic
1920 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Phone: 6473362753
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maple Health
1051 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2Y5
Phone: 6476971000
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 5928 Finch Avenue East
Vital Care Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: 416-678-2911
Fax: 416-461-0445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rashmy Amuthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeyaratnam (CPSO#: 117250 ) Dr. R. Amuthan (CPSO#: 115278 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Noble Clinic
2934 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166678488
Fax: 4164610445
Address: Maple Clinic
1920 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J 2E4
Phone: 6473362753
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Maple Health
1051 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H2Y5
Phone: 6476971000
Fax: 8773664575
Address: 5928 Finch Avenue East
Vital Care Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M1B 5P8
Phone: 416-678-2911
Fax: 416-461-0445

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rashmy Amuthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeyaratnam (CPSO#: 117250 ) Dr. R. Amuthan (CPSO#: 115278 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEYAROOBAN JEYARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARATNAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEYAROOBAN JEYARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Debrecen, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2018