THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:25:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NG AND KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ng (CPSO#: 117405 ) Dr. R. Kwan (CPSO#: 116042 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NG AND KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ng (CPSO#: 117405 ) Dr. R. Kwan (CPSO#: 116042 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYANN STEPHANIE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYANN STEPHANIE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2018