THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475297544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NG AND KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ng (CPSO#: 117405 ) Dr. R. Kwan (CPSO#: 116042 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6475297544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NG AND KWAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ng (CPSO#: 117405 ) Dr. R. Kwan (CPSO#: 116042 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIP CHUNG ALEX NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YIP CHUNG ALEX NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019