THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:31:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Spruce Street
Asphodel-Norwood Medical Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 3
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Phone: 705-639-2245
Fax: 705-639-2764

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ford and Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cormier (CPSO#: 118201 ) Dr. A. Ford (CPSO#: 118218 )
Business Address: 17 Spruce St Norwood, ON K0L 2V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Spruce Street
Asphodel-Norwood Medical Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 3
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Phone: 705-639-2245
Fax: 705-639-2764

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ford and Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cormier (CPSO#: 118201 ) Dr. A. Ford (CPSO#: 118218 )
Business Address: 17 Spruce St Norwood, ON K0L 2V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER SCOTT CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER SCOTT CORMIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORMIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019