THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:37:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Spruce Street
Asphodel-Norwood Medical Centre
Unit 3
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056392245
Fax: 7056392764
Address: 1600 West Bank Drive
Blackburn Hall
Suite 111
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ford and Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cormier (CPSO#: 118201 ) Dr. A. Ford (CPSO#: 118218 )
Business Address: 17 Spruce St Norwood, ON K0L 2V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17 Spruce Street
Asphodel-Norwood Medical Centre
Unit 3
Norwood Ontario K0L 2V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056392245
Fax: 7056392764
Address: 1600 West Bank Drive
Blackburn Hall
Suite 111
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B8
Phone: (705) 748-1481
Fax: 705-748-1055

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ford and Cormier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cormier (CPSO#: 118201 ) Dr. A. Ford (CPSO#: 118218 )
Business Address: 17 Spruce St Norwood, ON K0L 2V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELA FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019