THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-366-2733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 36 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittall Trought Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whittall (CPSO#: 118800 ) Dr. K. Trought (CPSO#: 132257 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 135 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-366-2733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 36 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittall Trought Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whittall (CPSO#: 118800 ) Dr. K. Trought (CPSO#: 132257 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PERREAULT WHITTALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN PERREAULT WHITTALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITTALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019