THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:47:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 105
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittall Trought Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whittall (CPSO#: 118800 ) Dr. K. Trought (CPSO#: 132257 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
Suite 105
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whittall Trought Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Whittall (CPSO#: 118800 ) Dr. K. Trought (CPSO#: 132257 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHLEEN TROUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROUGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHLEEN TROUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROUGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021