THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:40:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2441 Lakeshore Rd W
Infinity Health Centre
Oakville ON L6L 5V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058472021
Fax: 9058475042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitkowski Brodzik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mitkowski (CPSO#: 134087 ) Dr. P. Brodzik (CPSO#: 119096 )
Business Address: 2441 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6L 5V5
905-847-2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2441 Lakeshore Rd W
Infinity Health Centre
Oakville ON L6L 5V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058472021
Fax: 9058475042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitkowski Brodzik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mitkowski (CPSO#: 134087 ) Dr. P. Brodzik (CPSO#: 119096 )
Business Address: 2441 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6L 5V5
905-847-2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL BRODZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODZIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL BRODZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRODZIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019