THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 08:33:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Lower Simcoe St
Toronto ON M5J 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitkowski Brodzik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mitkowski (CPSO#: 134087 ) Dr. P. Brodzik (CPSO#: 119096 )
Business Address: 2441 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6L 5V5
905-847-2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Lower Simcoe St
Toronto ON M5J 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 504-0628
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 May 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitkowski Brodzik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mitkowski (CPSO#: 134087 ) Dr. P. Brodzik (CPSO#: 119096 )
Business Address: 2441 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6L 5V5
905-847-2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHY ANNA MITKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHY ANNA MITKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences Center for Medical Education in English, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2022