THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 07:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 267 Finch Ave W
Azar Medical Clinic
North York ON M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-992-9277
Fax: 416-250-1919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. FEKRI AND AZAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fekri (CPSO#: 120523 ) Dr. S. Doulatyari Azar (CPSO#: 132549 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
6479929277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 267 Finch Ave W
Azar Medical Clinic
North York ON M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-992-9277
Fax: 416-250-1919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. FEKRI AND AZAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fekri (CPSO#: 120523 ) Dr. S. Doulatyari Azar (CPSO#: 132549 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
6479929277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVEH FEKRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEKRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVEH FEKRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEKRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020