THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:10:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 267 Finch Ave W
Azar Medical Clinic
North York ON M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 992 9277
Fax: 416 250 1919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. FEKRI AND AZAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fekri (CPSO#: 120523 ) Dr. S. Doulatyari Azar (CPSO#: 132549 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
6479929277

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 267 Finch Ave W
Azar Medical Clinic
North York ON M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 992 9277
Fax: 416 250 1919

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DRS. FEKRI AND AZAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fekri (CPSO#: 120523 ) Dr. S. Doulatyari Azar (CPSO#: 132549 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
6479929277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAYEH DOULATYARI AZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOULATYARI AZAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAYEH DOULATYARI AZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOULATYARI AZAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021